OR HB2449 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends exemption to certain ports for property used or held for use to provide common carrier rail freight service to shippers. Extends exemption to certain ports for property used or held for use to provide common carrier rail freight service to shippers. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the property of a port; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2449 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2449/Introduced |