OR HB2412 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 to Higher Education Coordinating Commission to award grants to certain organizations. Appropriates $500,000] $5,000,000 to Higher Education Coordinating Commission to award grant to College Possible organization] grants to certain organizations. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to assistance to low income students to attend a post-secondary institution; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |