OR HB2048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 394, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 394, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Health Licensing Office to issue provisional registration to applicant for behavior analysis interventionist registration. Directs Health Licensing Office to issue provisional registration to applicant for behavior analysis interventionist registration. Becomes operative October 1, 2023. Requires office to contract with third party to study access to behavior analysis interventionists. Directs office to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health care not later than September 15, 2024.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to behavior analysis interventionists; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Chapter 394, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Gelser Blouin. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 2--Gelser Blouin, Weber; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Levy B. |
2023-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |