OR HB2041 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 5, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 5, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds parole and probation officers to definition of "police officer" for purposes of life insurance benefits for police officers and firefighters.
Title
Relating to life insurance benefits for certain Department of Corrections employees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Chapter 5, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Thomsen. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |