OK SR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR8
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emphasizing the value of Oklahoma's great outdoors; and supporting efforts to boost economy.
Title
Emphasizing the value of Oklahoma's great outdoors; and supporting efforts to boost economy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Taylor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SR8 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State