OK SR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR8
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing April 6, 2017 as "Tartan Day" in the State of Oklahoma; and directing distribution.
Title
A Resolution recognizing April 6, 2017 as "Tartan Day" in the State of Oklahoma; and directing distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2017-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SR8 (Carry Over) 2017-04-10 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State