OK SR6 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution encouraging the National Rifle Association to relocate their headquarters to Oklahoma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution encouraging the National Rifle Association to relocate their headquarters to Oklahoma.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateEnrolled, filed with Secretary of State
2021-03-01SenateAdopted, referred for enrollment
2021-03-01SenateConsidered
2021-03-01SenateDirect to Calendar
2021-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2021-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Haste
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator McCortney
2021-02-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2021-02-11SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-11SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback