OK SR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR4
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution declaring May 1, 2019, as Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma; and recognizing the heritage, culture and contributions of Hispanics to the State of Oklahoma.
Title
A resolution declaring May 1, 2019, as Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma; and recognizing the heritage, culture and contributions of Hispanics to the State of Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2019-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SR4 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State