OK SR14 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR14
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-9)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-9)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution celebrating Monday, March 29, 2021 as Vietnam Veterans Day in Oklahoma.
Title
Resolution celebrating Monday, March 29, 2021 as Vietnam Veterans Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Considered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Treat |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2021-03-25 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SR14 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State