OK SJR36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing that certain provision not be construed to prohibit certain military service. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing that certain provision not be construed to prohibit certain military service. Ballot title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |