OK SJR33 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitution Amendment to be referred for vote; small distillers exempt from sales restrictions. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitution Amendment to be referred for vote; small distillers exempt from sales restrictions. Ballot title.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
2020-02-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Coleman
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback