OK SCR40 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 102-47)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Declaring May 15, 2012 Breast Cancer Awareness Day in the State of Oklahoma

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring May 15, 2012 Breast Cancer Awareness Day in the State of Oklahoma

Sponsors

Sen. Thomas Adelson [D]Sen. Clifford Aldridge [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Patrick Anderson [R]
Rep. Don Armes [R]Sen. Roger Ballenger [D]Rep. Gary Banz [R]Sen. Don Barrington [R]
Sen. Randy Bass [D]Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Lisa Billy [R]Sen. Brian Bingman [R]
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R]Sen. Cliff Branan [R]Sen. Josh Brecheen [R]Sen. Rick Brinkley [R]
Sen. Bill Brown [R]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Sen. Michael Burrage [D]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]
Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Sen. Greg Childers [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]Sen. Harry Coates [R]
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]
Rep. Doug Cox [R]Sen. Brian Crain [R]Rep. David Dank [R]Sen. Kim David [R]
Rep. Lee Denney [R]Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. Dale DeWitt [R]Rep. Joe Dorman [D]
Sen. Jerry Ellis [D]Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Rusty Farley [R]Rep. George Faught [R]
Sen. Eddie Fields [R]Sen. John Ford [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Sen. Earl Garrison [D]
Rep. Larry Glenn [D]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Sen. Ann Griffin [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]
Sen. Jim Halligan [R]Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]
Rep. Wes Hilliard [D]Rep. Corey Holland [R]Sen. David Holt [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]
Rep. Scott Inman [D]Sen. Tom Ivester [D]Rep. Michael Jackson [R]Sen. Constance Johnson [D]
Sen. Rob Johnson [R]Sen. Rob Johnson [R]Sen. Clark Jolley [R]Rep. Fred Jordan [R]
Rep. Charles Joyner [R]Sen. Ron Justice [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]Rep. Charles Key [R]
Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Sen. Charles Laster [D]Sen. Richard Lerblance [D]
Rep. Guy Liebmann [R]Rep. James Lockhart [D]Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R]Rep. Scott Martin [R]
Rep. Steve Martin [R]Sen. Michael Mazzei [R]Sen. Al McAffrey [D]Rep. Mark McCullough [R]
Rep. Curtis McDaniel [D]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Sen. Judy McIntyre [D]
Rep. Skye McNiel [R]Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Danny Morgan [D]
Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Sen. David Myers [R]
Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Sen. Dan Newberry [R]Rep. Tom Newell [R]Sen. Jonathan Nichols [R]
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]
Sen. Susan Paddack [D]Rep. Ron Peters [R]Rep. Pam Peterson [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]
Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]
Sen. Jim Reynolds [R]Sen. Andrew Rice [D]Rep. Phil Richardson [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]
Rep. Paul Roan [D]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]
Rep. Todd Russ [R]Sen. Steve Russell [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Sen. Mike Schulz [R]
Rep. Michael Schwartz [R]Rep. Seneca Scott [D]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R]
Rep. Mike Shelton [D]Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]
Sen. Jabar Shumate [D]Sen. Frank Simpson [R]Sen. John Sparks [D]Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R]
Rep. Kris Steele [R]Rep. Aaron Stiles [R]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]Rep. Randy Terrill [R]
Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Sue Tibbs [R]Sen. Greg Treat [R]Rep. John Trebilcock [R]
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Purcy Walker [D]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Sen. Jim Wilson [D]Rep. Harold Wright [R]
Sen. Charles Wyrick [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-21 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
2012-05-21 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-21 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-18 Adopted, returned to Senate
2012-05-18 Coauthored by all other Representatives
2012-05-18 Considered
2012-05-16 Introduced
2012-05-16 Engrossed to House
2012-05-15 Adopted, referred for engrossment
2012-05-15 coauthored by all other Senators
2012-05-15 Considered
2012-05-15 Direct to Calendar
2012-05-03 coauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
2012-05-03 Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre
2012-05-03 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback