OK SCR4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Concurrent resolution enacting Joint Rules for the 53rd Legislature.
Title
Concurrent resolution enacting Joint Rules for the 53rd Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-02-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-02-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-02-15 | Adopted, returned to Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Ayes: 89 Nays: 11 | |
2011-02-15 | Considered | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced | |
2011-02-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-14 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-14 | Considered | |
2011-02-08 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | coauthored by Steele (principal House author) | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |