OK SB997 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - coauthored by Dank (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-24 - coauthored by Dank (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Attorneys; making payment of certain dues voluntary. Effective date.
Title
Attorneys; making payment of certain dues voluntary. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. David Dank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Dank | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-16 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb997&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb997_int.rtf |