OK SB991 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting stacking of certain insurance policies. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting stacking of certain insurance policies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |