OK SB977 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Community Economic Development Pooled Finance Act; modifying certain prohibition. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Community Economic Development Pooled Finance Act; modifying certain prohibition. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 5 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 5 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace |
2018-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Sharp |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 5 Nays: 36 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |