OK SB967 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB967
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual assault collection kits; providing for creation and implementation of statewide electronic tracking system. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sexual assault collection kits; providing for creation and implementation of statewide electronic tracking system. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Sims |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Nollan |
2019-04-15 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Emergency added |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB967 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019