OK SB967 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sexual assault collection kits; providing for creation and implementation of statewide electronic tracking system. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault collection kits; providing for creation and implementation of statewide electronic tracking system. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateApproved by Governor 04/18/2019
2019-04-16SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-16SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-16Senatecoauthored by Sims
2019-04-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1
2019-04-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Nollan
2019-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-11SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-20SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateEmergency added
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback