OK SB941 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB941
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Talley, Fetgatter, May, Moore, Waldron, Rosecrants, Hardin, McDugle, Munson
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Talley, Fetgatter, May, Moore, Waldron, Rosecrants, Hardin, McDugle, Munson
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Fish and wildlife; updating fishing and hunting licenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Fish and wildlife; updating fishing and hunting licenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Talley, Fetgatter, May, Moore, Waldron, Rosecrants, Hardin, McDugle, Munson |
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2023-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB941 (Carry Over) 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Talley, Fetgatter, May, Moore, Waldron, Rosecrants, Hardin, McDugle, Munson