OK SB928 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjutant General; authorizing Adjutant General to execute certain agreements. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Adjutant General; authorizing Adjutant General to execute certain agreements. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | General Order |
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |