OK SB908 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Immigration; prohibiting smuggling of human beings; authorizing certain seizure and forfeiture of property; providing procedures. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Immigration; prohibiting smuggling of human beings; authorizing certain seizure and forfeiture of property; providing procedures. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Shortey | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-23 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1550 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 210 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 210 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 210 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 210 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 201 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 201 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 201 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |