OK SB902 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-21 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-21 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Boating safety; modifying procedures if boating while under the influence; modifying penalties. Effective date.
Title
Boating safety; modifying procedures if boating while under the influence; modifying penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure sent to House | |
2010-05-21 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-21 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 27 Nays: 11 | |
2010-05-19 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Brown | |
2010-05-19 | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 24 | |
2010-05-19 | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-13 | 2 CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named, naming same conferees: Ritze, Key, Reynolds, Kern, Proctor, Jones, Tibbs, Roan, Smithson | |
2010-04-26 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-26 | Further conference granted | |
2010-04-22 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-22 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-22 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | Considered and deferred | |
2009-05-22 | Considered and deferred | |
2009-05-20 | Title restored | |
2009-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named Ritze, Key, Reynolds, Kern, Proctor, Jones, Tibbs, Roan, Smithson | |
2009-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-22 | HAs read | |
2009-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-21 | Amended | |
2009-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2009-04-21 | General Order | |
2009-04-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 | |
2009-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Ritze (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Ritze | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 4210 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 4210 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 4210A | New Code | See Bill Text |