OK SB868 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB868
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Department; allowing certain federal programs to be regarded as individual purchasing entity under certain conditions. Emergency.
Title
Military Department; allowing certain federal programs to be regarded as individual purchasing entity under certain conditions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Manger |
2021-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Emergency added |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB868 (Carry Over) 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021