OK SB839 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB839
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Game wardens; prohibiting cameras on private property without permission unless pursuant to a warrant. Effective date.
Title
Game wardens; prohibiting cameras on private property without permission unless pursuant to a warrant. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10 |
2021-04-19 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB839 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021