OK SB813 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB813
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; authorizing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to operate a quality assurance laboratory. Emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; authorizing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to operate a quality assurance laboratory. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2023 |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-18 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Garvin, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Weaver, Newhouse, Prieto, Young |
2023-05-08 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB813 (Carry Over) 2023-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2023