OK SB80 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Absentee ballots; modifying time absentee ballots may be counted; prohibiting certain disclosure. Effective date.
Title
Absentee ballots; modifying time absentee ballots may be counted; prohibiting certain disclosure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Dorman (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 14 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |