OK SB791 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Advanced; laid over; remains on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Advanced; laid over; remains on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; providing for approval of tuition and fees by the Legislature. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; providing for approval of tuition and fees by the Legislature. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | Advanced; laid over; remains on Third Reading | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Reynolds (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-20 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Reynolds | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-19 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sykes | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Reynolds | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3218 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3218 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3218 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb791&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb791_int.rtf |