OK SB779 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; creating the Oklahoma Abortion-Inducing Drug Certification Program Act; providing requirements for manufacturers and distributors; reporting. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; creating the Oklahoma Abortion-Inducing Drug Certification Program Act; providing requirements for manufacturers and distributors; reporting. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2021
2021-05-25SenateSent to Governor
2021-05-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-05-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-05-25HouseTo Senate
2021-05-25HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16
2021-05-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Roberts (Sean)
2021-05-25HouseCCR adopted
2021-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2021-05-19SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2021-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2021-05-13SenateEnacting clause restored
2021-05-13SenateTitle restored
2021-05-13SenateCCR read
2021-05-06HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2021-05-04SenateSCs named Daniels, McCortney, Rosino, Simpson, Dossett (J.A.), Hicks
2021-04-26SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2021-04-22SenateHAs read
2021-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
2021-04-21HouseEnacting clause stricken
2021-04-21HouseTitle stricken
2021-04-21HouseAmended
2021-04-21HouseAmended by floor substitute
2021-04-21HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-04-21HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2021-04-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dills, Gann, Smith
2021-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-07HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jett
2021-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
2021-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Taylor
2021-03-09SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2021-03-03SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-09SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Boren
2021-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-03SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Senator Boren
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb779&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB779%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB779%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB779%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB779%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB779%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB779%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB779%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB779%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB779%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB779%20FA1%20LEPAKMA-AB(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB779%20FA2%20HILBERTKY-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB779%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB779%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB779%20CS%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB779%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB779%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB779%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB779%20CCS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB779_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB779_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback