OK SB762 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - SCs named Pederson, Dahm, Coleman, Howard, Floyd, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public bidding and public contracts; authorizing local bid preference; adopting certain policies. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public bidding and public contracts; authorizing local bid preference; adopting certain policies. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSCs named Pederson, Dahm, Coleman, Howard, Floyd, Young
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Branham
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Pederson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb762&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB762%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB762%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB762%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB762%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB762%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB762%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB762%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB762_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB762_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback