OK SB762 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB762

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Statutes of limitation; establishing statutes of limitation for certain actions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statutes of limitation; establishing statutes of limitation for certain actions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
2017-03-21SenateTitle restored
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author)
2017-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Sykes
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB762 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback