OK SB707 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; setting deadline for presentation of certain certification or certificate of exemption for immunizations; allowing attendance of school during certain period. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; setting deadline for presentation of certain certification or certificate of exemption for immunizations; allowing attendance of school during certain period. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
2021-02-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback