OK SB679 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Certified medication aides; permitting certified medication aides to distribute medications in jails. Effective date.
Title
Certified medication aides; permitting certified medication aides to distribute medications in jails. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Table AmdToAmd (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Table AmdToAmd (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved by Governor 05/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-20 | HAs read | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2011-04-19 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | Title restored | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Trebilcock (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-21 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |