OK SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Child custody; requiring certain written findings; clarifying right of appeal. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody; requiring certain written findings; clarifying right of appeal. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Randleman (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback