OK SB639 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Child Abuse Response Team; full-time positions within the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abuse Response Team; full-time positions within the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 36 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-21HouseTo Senate
2014-05-21HouseMeasure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2014-05-21House2 CCR adopted
2014-05-20House2 CCR submitted
2014-05-20SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2014-05-20Senate2 CCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-15SenateEmergency added
2014-05-15Senate2 CCR read
2014-05-06HouseHC's named, naming same conferees: Conference Committee on Human Services
2014-04-23SenateFurther conference granted, GCCA
2014-03-26HouseCCR rejected, further conference requested, conferees to be named later
2014-03-25HouseLaid over
2014-03-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2014-03-25HouseCCR considered
2013-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2013-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2013-05-22SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2013-05-21SenateEmergency removed
2013-05-21SenateTitle restored
2013-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2013-05-06SenateSCs named GCCA
2013-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Human Services
2013-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2013-04-23SenateHAs read
2013-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2013-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Wright, Nelson, Ownbey, McCullough
2013-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-02HouseEmergency added
2013-04-02HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance), Allen
2013-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
2013-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Human Services
2013-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2013-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-03-12Senatecoauthored by Griffin
2013-02-25Senatecoauthored by Ivester
2013-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2013-02-18Senatecoauthored by Hulbert (principal House author)
2013-02-13SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2013-02-12SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2013-02-12SenateWithdrawn from Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation committee
2013-02-05SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2013-02-04Senatecoauthored by Treat
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator David
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7415038New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback