OK SB614 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Coauthored by Senator Burns
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Coauthored by Senator Burns
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; affording certain rights to students enrolled in certain institutions. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; affording certain rights to students enrolled in certain institutions. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB614 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Coauthored by Senator Burns