OK SB6 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; expenses for special elections; recovery.
Title
Elections; expenses for special elections; recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-09-25 | Senate | First Reading |