OK SB58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB58
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; extending allowed time for employees to vote. Emergency.
Title
Elections; extending allowed time for employees to vote. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13 |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB58 (Carry Over) 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019