OK SB544 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Food licenses; providing limit on fees for farmer's market or county fair. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food licenses; providing limit on fees for farmer's market or county fair. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-05-08SenateSCs named Murdock, Pederson, Hall, Kidd, Boren, Dossett
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sanders
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb544&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB544%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB544%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB544%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB544%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB544%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB544%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB544%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB544%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB544_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB544_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback