OK SB537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB537
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Poultry Products Inspection Act; providing exemptions authorized by USDA. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Poultry Products Inspection Act; providing exemptions authorized by USDA. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boren |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB537 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development