OK SB516 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; providing termination date for certain trust. Effective date.
Title
Public health; providing termination date for certain trust. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |