OK SB494 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Private Lands and Public Recreation Act; penalties; authorizing certain licenses to be revoked. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Private Lands and Public Recreation Act; penalties; authorizing certain licenses to be revoked. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Considered and deferred | |
2011-04-27 | HAs read | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0; Ayes: 53 Nays: 26 | |
2011-04-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1835 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |