OK SB47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB47
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; establishing "Oklahoma Aviation and Aerospace Day". Effective date.
Title
Definitions and general provisions; establishing "Oklahoma Aviation and Aerospace Day". Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017