OK SB451 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Coauthored by McDugle
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Coauthored by McDugle
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; expanding scope of prohibited act; removing administrative penalty. Emergency.
Title
Firearms; expanding scope of prohibited act; removing administrative penalty. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by McDugle |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB451 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - coauthored by McDugle