OK SB418 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Consumer Credit Code; modifying qualifications for appointment of members of the Commission on Consumer Credit. Effective date.
Title
Consumer Credit Code; modifying qualifications for appointment of members of the Commission on Consumer Credit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Randy Bass [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Died in GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named Armes, Dorman, DeWitt, Schwartz, Shoemake | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-21 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-03-31 | HAs read | |
2009-03-31 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-30 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-30 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2009-03-30 | General Order | |
2009-03-19 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-03-19 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Armes | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Bass | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |