OK SB41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Pending: House Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Pending: House Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environmental agency jurisdiction; modifying jurisdiction over certain wetlands. Effective date.
Title
Environmental agency jurisdiction; modifying jurisdiction over certain wetlands. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Withdrawn from Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2013-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 10 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 10 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Moore (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coates |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 3 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |