OK SB409 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Hearing: Apr 14 @ 3:00 pm in ROOM 450
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sales and use tax; modifying time period of exemption for certain computer and telecommunications equipment purchase. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; modifying time period of exemption for certain computer and telecommunications equipment purchase. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2021-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-09SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-02SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb409&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB409%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB409%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB409%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB409%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB409%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB409%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB409%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB409%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB409%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB409%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB409_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB409_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback