OK SB394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB394
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; modifying circumstances under which substitute candidate's name may appear on ballot. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying circumstances under which substitute candidate's name may appear on ballot. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Virgin (principal House author) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB394 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019