OK SB387 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB387

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Coauthored by Representative Boles
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax; expanding exemption to include custom order manufacturing. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; expanding exemption to include custom order manufacturing. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles
2021-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
2021-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Haste
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB387 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback