OK SB387 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; relating to license violations; establishing procedures for fair compensation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; relating to license violations; establishing procedures for fair compensation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 28 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 24
2014-05-23House2 CCR adopted
2014-05-21House2 CCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
2014-05-21Senate2 CCR adopted
2014-05-20Senate2 CCR read
2014-05-14SenateSCs changed David to Stanislawski
2014-05-07SenateSCs changed Simpson to Newberry
2014-05-05HouseFurther conference granted, same conferees
2014-02-17SenateCoauthored by Mazzei
2014-02-17SenateRemove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Newberry
2013-05-24SenateCCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
2013-05-23SenateTitle restored
2013-05-23SenateCCR read
2013-05-22SenateSCs named Mazzei, Brinkley, David, Simpson, Sparks, McAffrey
2013-05-22SenateWithdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
2013-05-13HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2013-05-02SenateSCs named GCCA
2013-05-01SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2013-04-17SenateHAs read
2013-04-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13
2013-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-26SenateEngrossed to House
2013-02-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-02-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-02-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-05SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Mazzei
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711352New CodeSee Bill Text
475611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
475651New CodeSee Bill Text
475652New CodeSee Bill Text
475653New CodeSee Bill Text
741505New CodeSee Bill Text
741509New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback