OK SB385 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB385
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain samples of beer, wine and spirits in retail spirit licensee premises. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing certain samples of beer, wine and spirits in retail spirit licensee premises. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 22 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Carry Over) 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021